NY S04160 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-11 - signed chap.365
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-11 - signed chap.365
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the disposition of foreign fire insurance premium taxes received by the Volunteer Exempt Firefighter's Benevolent Association of Whitehall, New York.
Title
Relates to the disposition of foreign fire insurance premium taxes received by the Volunteer Exempt Firefighter's Benevolent Association of Whitehall, New York.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-11 | Senate | signed chap.365 |
2019-10-01 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.1815 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4160A |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-19 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-06-19 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.496 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | rules report cal.496 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | reported |
2019-06-17 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-12 | Senate | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-05-01 | Senate | print number 6588a |
2019-05-01 | Senate | amend and recommit to local governments |
2019-03-12 | Senate | referred to local governments |
2019-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A6588A |
2019-06-20 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1815 |
2019-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-01 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4160A |
2019-05-01 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-03-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A06588 (Same As) 2019-10-11 - signed chap.365