NY S04158 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-14 - APPROVAL MEMO.1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-14 - APPROVAL MEMO.1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to establishing a moratorium on the adoption or implementation of any local law, ordinance, rule or regulation in a city with a population of one million or more related to charging a fee for carryout merchandise bags or a fee of similar effect.
Title
Relates to establishing a moratorium on the adoption or implementation of any local law, ordinance, rule or regulation in a city with a population of one million or more related to charging a fee for carryout merchandise bags or a fee of similar effect.
Sponsors
Sen. Simcha Felder [D] | Sen. Martin Golden [R] | Sen. Diane Savino [D] | Sen. Tony Avella [D] |
Sen. Andrew Lanza [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 122 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-14 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.1 |
2017-02-14 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.7 |
2017-02-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2017-02-07 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2017-02-07 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-02-07 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.20 |
2017-02-07 | Assembly | substituted for a4883 |
2017-02-06 | Assembly | referred to cities |
2017-02-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-02-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-02-06 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.148 |
2017-02-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A04883 (Same As) 2017-02-07 - substituted by s4158