NY S04156 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to changes in assessment for businesses that make payments in lieu of taxes; establishes that any reduction in school taxes shall not take effect until the following taxable status year.
Title
Relates to changes in assessment for businesses that make payments in lieu of taxes; establishes that any reduction in school taxes shall not take effect until the following taxable status year.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-05-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-05-16 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-15 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1181 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2017-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-06-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-06-05 | Senate | AMENDED 4156A |
2017-05-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1108 |
2017-02-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A07211 (Same As) 2018-06-19 - REFERRED TO RULES