NY S04129 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - PRINT NUMBER 4129A
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - PRINT NUMBER 4129A
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Awards attorney's fees and expert witness fees in appropriate cases.
Title
Awards attorney's fees and expert witness fees in appropriate cases.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4129A |
2020-02-11 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2019-03-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A02475 (Same As) 2020-01-27 - amended on third reading 2475a