NY S04117 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-21 - referred to housing
Pending: Assembly Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-21 - referred to housing
Pending: Assembly Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the eviction of tenants for using medical marihuana for a certified medical use.
Title
Prohibits the eviction of tenants for using medical marihuana for a certified medical use.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction and Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction and Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction and Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction and Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-21 | Assembly | referred to housing |
2020-07-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-01-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-01-22 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.213 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-04-01 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2019-04-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-04-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-03-28 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-03-27 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.325 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4117A |
2019-03-19 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2019-02-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A07764 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to housing