NY S04116 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-15 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-15 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "Long Island power authority ratepayers protection act"; provides that any issuance of bonds by the authority must be authorized by a majority of the ratepayers of the authority by a public referendum after at least one public hearing in each of the affected counties; makes related provisions.
Title
Enacts the "Long Island power authority ratepayers protection act"; provides that any issuance of bonds by the authority must be authorized by a majority of the ratepayers of the authority by a public referendum after at least one public hearing in each of the affected counties; makes related provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-15 - Senate - Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2018-01-17 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4116A |
2018-01-17 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2017-02-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A04757 (Same As) 2018-01-17 - print number 4757a