NY S04080 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-01 - SIGNED CHAP.43
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-01 - SIGNED CHAP.43
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires food retailers to provide scales for customer use in an accessible location and with a conspicuous sign reading "for customer use".
Title
Requires food retailers to provide scales for customer use in an accessible location and with a conspicuous sign reading "for customer use".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-01 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.43 |
2011-05-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2011-05-09 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2011-05-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-05-09 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.263 |
2011-05-09 | Assembly | substituted for a6423 |
2011-04-04 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
2011-04-04 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-04-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-03-28 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2011-03-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2011-03-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.261 |
2011-03-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
Same As/Similar To
A06423 (Same As) 2011-05-09 - substituted by s4080