NY S04049 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on September 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-06 - SIGNED CHAP.420
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that a claimant shall not be paid such benefits in excess of twenty-six times the amount of regular compensation (including dependents' allowances) payable to such individual for a week of total unemployment during a benefit year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides that a claimant shall not be paid such benefits in excess of twenty-six times the amount of regular compensation (including dependents' allowances) payable to such individual for a week of total unemployment during a benefit year.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 103 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-06AssemblySIGNED CHAP.420
2021-09-03SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2021-05-25Assemblyreturned to senate
2021-05-25Assemblypassed assembly
2021-05-05Assemblyordered to third reading cal.259
2021-05-05Assemblysubstituted for a5678
2021-03-01Assemblyreferred to labor
2021-03-01SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2021-03-01SenatePASSED SENATE
2021-02-22SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2021-02-10Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2021-02-09Senate1ST REPORT CAL.367
2021-02-01SenateREFERRED TO LABOR

Same As/Similar To

A05678 (Same As) 2021-05-05 - substituted by s4049

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback