NY S04037 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-31 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4092
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-31 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4092
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the bond authority of the Livingston county water and sewer authority from $42,000,000 to $70,000,000.
Title
Increases the bond authority of the Livingston county water and sewer authority from $42,000,000 to $70,000,000.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-31 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A4092 |
2023-05-30 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-05-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-05-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1234 |
2023-02-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A04092 (Same As) 2023-09-15 - signed chap.384