NY S04030 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS
Pending: Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS
Pending: Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the contents of emergency response plans required to be submitted to the public service commission by electric corporations; requires such plans to include details of staffing, equipment, and ability to perform toward certain standards; requires the public service commission to establish a time-based restoration schedule.
Title
Relates to the contents of emergency response plans required to be submitted to the public service commission by electric corporations; requires such plans to include details of staffing, equipment, and ability to perform toward certain standards; requires the public service commission to establish a time-based restoration schedule.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2021-05-21 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4030A |
2021-05-21 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2021-02-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A01925 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions
A07541 (Same As) 2022-03-23 - REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS
A07541 (Same As) 2022-03-23 - REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS