NY S04025 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4217
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4217
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that state lands within the Eastport-South Manor Central School District are subject to taxation for school purposes.
Title
Provides that state lands within the Eastport-South Manor Central School District are subject to taxation for school purposes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A4217 |
2022-05-25 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1528 |
2022-05-25 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2021-02-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A04217 (Same As) 2022-12-16 - signed chap.692