NY S04006 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-10)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the types of damages that may be awarded to the persons for whose benefit an action for wrongful death is brought i.e. grief and anguish; loss of love, society, protection, comfort, companionship and consortium; reasonable funeral expenses; reasonable expenses for medical care, treatment etc. prior to death; pecuniary injuries due to loss of services, support, inheritance; and loss of nurture, guidance or education.
Title
Provides for the types of damages that may be awarded to the persons for whose benefit an action for wrongful death is brought i.e. grief and anguish; loss of love, society, protection, comfort, companionship and consortium; reasonable funeral expenses; reasonable expenses for medical care, treatment etc. prior to death; pecuniary injuries due to loss of services, support, inheritance; and loss of nurture, guidance or education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2019-05-30 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-02-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A05612 (Same As) 2020-07-22 - ordered to third reading rules cal.300