NY S03981 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-08 - PRINT NUMBER 3981B
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-08 - PRINT NUMBER 3981B
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes care and services provided by licensed mental health practitioners eligible for coverage under the Medicaid program.
Title
Makes care and services provided by licensed mental health practitioners eligible for coverage under the Medicaid program.
Sponsors
Sen. Diane Savino [D] | Sen. Tony Avella [D] | Sen. David Carlucci [D] | Sen. Jesse Hamilton [D] |
Sen. Robert Ortt [R] | Sen. Patricia Ritchie [R] | Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-08 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3981B |
2018-06-08 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.468 |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a1890a |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-06-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-12 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1546 |
2017-06-12 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-06-08 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3981A |
2017-06-08 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2017-05-02 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2017-01-31 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |