NY S03971 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-24 - SIGNED CHAP.110
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-24 - SIGNED CHAP.110
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates a temporary state commission to study and investigate how to regulate artificial intelligence, robotics and automation; and repeals such commission.
Title
Creates a temporary state commission to study and investigate how to regulate artificial intelligence, robotics and automation; and repeals such commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Internet And Technology Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Internet And Technology Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-24 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.110 |
2019-07-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.481 |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | substituted for a1746c |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2019-05-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-13 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 3971B |
2019-04-29 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 3971A |
2019-03-14 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-03-13 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.277 |
2019-02-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO INTERNET AND TECHNOLOGY |
Same As/Similar To
A01746 (Same As) 2019-07-24 - SIGNED CHAP.110