NY S03962 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on December 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-23 - approval memo.79
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on December 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-23 - approval memo.79
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires hospitals to establish policies and procedures regarding domestic violence; establishes ongoing training programs on domestic violence for all current and new hospital employees; designates a hospital staff member to coordinate services to victims; provides for the interaction of hospitals with community domestic violence service providers in order to coordinate services to victims of domestic violence; requires hospitals to offer to contact a local advocate when admitting or treating a confirmed or suspected victim of domestic violence.
Title
Requires hospitals to establish policies and procedures regarding domestic violence; establishes ongoing training programs on domestic violence for all current and new hospital employees; designates a hospital staff member to coordinate services to victims; provides for the interaction of hospitals with community domestic violence service providers in order to coordinate services to victims of domestic violence; requires hospitals to offer to contact a local advocate when admitting or treating a confirmed or suspected victim of domestic violence.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-23 | Senate | approval memo.79 |
2019-12-23 | Senate | signed chap.733 |
2019-12-19 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.679 |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3962A |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2019-05-14 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-05-14 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-03-04 | Senate | amended on third reading 2850a |
2019-02-21 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.63 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | reported |
2019-01-25 | Senate | referred to health |
2019-05-14 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A2850A |
2019-05-14 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.679 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-03-04 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3962A |
2019-03-04 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2019-02-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A02850 (Same As) 2019-12-23 - approval memo.79