NY S03960 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-08 - signed chap.451
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-08 - signed chap.451
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that increased rates of payment for behavioral health services shall be deemed to be effective on the date of the law, rule or regulation under which the change or increase is required.
Title
Provides that increased rates of payment for behavioral health services shall be deemed to be effective on the date of the law, rule or regulation under which the change or increase is required.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-08 | Senate | signed chap.451 |
2019-10-28 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.1494 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3960 |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-13 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-06-13 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-11 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.104 |
2019-06-11 | Senate | rules report cal.104 |
2019-06-11 | Senate | reported |
2019-06-05 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2019-02-28 | Senate | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-01-25 | Senate | referred to health |
2019-06-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A2787 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1494 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-02-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A02787 (Same As) 2019-11-08 - signed chap.451