NY S03928 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-09 - PRINT NUMBER 3928A
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-09 - PRINT NUMBER 3928A
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes school districts to purchase manipulatives with money that has otherwise been set aside for the purchase of textbooks.
Title
Authorizes school districts to purchase manipulatives with money that has otherwise been set aside for the purchase of textbooks.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-09 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3928A |
2014-01-09 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2013-02-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A03805 (Same As) 2013-06-05 - REFERRED TO EDUCATION