NY S03897 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-24 - referred to local governments
Pending: Assembly Local Governments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-24 - referred to local governments
Pending: Assembly Local Governments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to use of official seals.
Title
Relates to use of official seals.
Sponsors
Sen. Kathleen Marchione [R] | Sen. John DeFrancisco [R] | Sen. Rich Funke [R] | Sen. Patrick Gallivan [R] |
Sen. William Larkin [R] | Sen. Terrence Murphy [R] | Sen. Patricia Ritchie [R] | Sen. James Seward [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-24 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2016-05-24 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-05-24 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-02-09 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-02-08 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-02-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.116 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2015-06-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-05-18 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-05-13 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-05-12 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.609 |
2015-04-29 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3897A |
2015-04-29 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2015-02-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A03569 (Same As) 2016-05-23 - held for consideration in local governments