NY S03884 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-23 - SIGNED CHAP.378
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-23 - SIGNED CHAP.378
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Limits the taking of sharks to the use of non-stainless non-offset circle hooks.
Title
Limits the taking of sharks to the use of non-stainless non-offset circle hooks.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-23 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.378 |
2014-09-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.64 |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | substituted for a5421a |
2014-06-03 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2014-06-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-03 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-05-28 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-05-21 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-05-20 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.807 |
2014-01-31 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3884A |
2014-01-31 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2013-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2013-04-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2013-04-17 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.287 |
2013-02-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A05421 (Same As) 2014-06-09 - substituted by s3884a