NY S03850 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-09 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-09 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes domestic companion animals be permitted to board any public transportation or public transportation service in the event of a state of emergency and evacuation.
Title
Authorizes domestic companion animals be permitted to board any public transportation or public transportation service in the event of a state of emergency and evacuation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-09 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2016-03-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-03-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-03-02 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-03-01 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-02-29 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.246 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2015-06-03 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2015-06-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-03 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-05-18 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-05-13 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-05-12 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.655 |
2015-02-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A00884 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions