NY S03807 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Vetoed on November 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - VETOED MEMO.161
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - VETOED MEMO.161
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to creating the "empire state cricket task force" to promote and grow the game of cricket in New York state.
Title
Relates to creating the "empire state cricket task force" to promote and grow the game of cricket in New York state.
Sponsors
Sen. Kevin Thomas [D] | Sen. George Amedore [R] | Sen. Neil Breslin [D] | Sen. David Carlucci [D] |
Sen. Kevin Parker [D] | Sen. Roxanne Persaud [D] | Sen. Jose Serrano [D] | Sen. James Tedisco [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Cultural Affairs, Tourism, Parks And Recreation Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Cultural Affairs, Tourism, Parks And Recreation Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-25 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.161 |
2019-11-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.148 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | substituted for a6306b |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-06-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | AMENDED (T) 3807B |
2019-05-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1032 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3807A |
2019-05-15 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
2019-02-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
Same As/Similar To
A06306 (Same As) 2019-11-25 - VETOED MEMO.161