NY S03792 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-28 - SIGNED CHAP.280
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-28 - SIGNED CHAP.280
Summary
Relates to the time period for sending out notice of the end of trial offers.
Title
Relates to the time period for sending out notice of the end of trial offers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-28 | SIGNED CHAP.280 | |
2009-07-17 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | |
2009-06-17 | returned to senate | |
2009-06-17 | passed assembly | |
2009-06-17 | ordered to third reading rules cal.401 | |
2009-06-17 | substituted for a4908 | |
2009-05-27 | referred to codes | |
2009-05-27 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2009-05-27 | PASSED SENATE | |
2009-05-18 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | |
2009-05-13 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | |
2009-05-12 | 1ST REPORT CAL.306 | |
2009-04-21 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO CODES | |
2009-04-01 | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A04908 (Same As) 2009-07-28 - SIGNED CHAP.280
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S03792&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |