NY S03789 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-09 - SUBSTITUTED BY A949
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-09 - SUBSTITUTED BY A949
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the public service commission to require water-works corporations to provide certain residents with non-billing related information.
Title
Authorizes the public service commission to require water-works corporations to provide certain residents with non-billing related information.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-09 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A949 |
2021-06-08 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1633 |
2021-06-08 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-01-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A00949 (Same As) 2021-07-01 - signed chap.191