NY S03736 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-01 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-01 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to requiring agencies to provide unsuccessful bidders that are certified minority- and women-owned business enterprises with a written statement of the completion of the procurement selection process and that such enterprise was not selected.
Title
Relates to requiring agencies to provide unsuccessful bidders that are certified minority- and women-owned business enterprises with a written statement of the completion of the procurement selection process and that such enterprise was not selected.
Sponsors
Sen. Leroy Comrie [D] | Sen. John Liu [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate Procurement and Contracts Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate Procurement and Contracts Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2022-06-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-06-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-02 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-04-27 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-04-26 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.825 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO PROCUREMENT AND CONTRACTS |
2021-01-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO PROCUREMENT AND CONTRACTS |
Same As/Similar To
A06074 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to governmental operations