NY S03721 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-11 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8486
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-11 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8486
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to service credit of certain members of the New York state and local employees' retirement system who obtained credit for service with the Niagara Frontier Transit Metro System, Inc.; provides that any retirement or death benefit payable or paid by such retirement system shall be reduced by the amount of the non-forfeitable benefit payable or paid for such service under the Amalgamated Transit Union Local 1342 - Niagara Frontier Transit Metro System Pension Fund.
Title
Relates to service credit of certain members of the New York state and local employees' retirement system who obtained credit for service with the Niagara Frontier Transit Metro System, Inc.; provides that any retirement or death benefit payable or paid by such retirement system shall be reduced by the amount of the non-forfeitable benefit payable or paid for such service under the Amalgamated Transit Union Local 1342 - Niagara Frontier Transit Metro System Pension Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-11 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A8486 |
2014-02-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-01-28 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.66 |
2014-01-17 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3721A |
2014-01-17 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2013-06-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-06-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-03-20 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2013-03-19 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2013-03-18 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.220 |
2013-02-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |