NY S03666 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-27 - PRINT NUMBER 3666C
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-27 - PRINT NUMBER 3666C
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes domestic abuse offenses for assaults upon spouses, former spouses, fellow parents of a child in common and domestic partners; provides for issuance of a special information for domestic abuse in the first degree requiring a predicate criminal conviction; designates such domestic abuse offenses as family offenses for purposes of the criminal procedure law and the family court act.
Title
Establishes domestic abuse offenses for assaults upon spouses, former spouses, fellow parents of a child in common and domestic partners; provides for issuance of a special information for domestic abuse in the first degree requiring a predicate criminal conviction; designates such domestic abuse offenses as family offenses for purposes of the criminal procedure law and the family court act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-27 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3666C |
2012-04-27 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CODES |
2012-03-29 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3666B |
2012-03-29 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CODES |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2011-06-03 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3666A |
2011-06-03 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CODES |
2011-03-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A05890 (Same As) 2012-05-01 - print number 5890c