NY S03662 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the collection of certain demographic information by certain state agencies, boards and commissions.
Title
Requires the collection of certain demographic information by certain state agencies, boards and commissions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-06 | Senate | tabled |
2019-12-06 | Senate | vetoed memo.172 |
2019-11-26 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.1244 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3662 |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-03 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-06-03 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-02-21 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.49 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | reported |
2019-02-05 | Senate | reported referred to codes |
2019-01-09 | Senate | referred to governmental operations |
2019-06-11 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A677 |
2019-06-11 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1244 |
2019-06-11 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-02-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A00677 (Same As) 2019-12-06 - tabled