NY S03657 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-27 - PRINT NUMBER 3657C
Pending: Senate Aging Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-27 - PRINT NUMBER 3657C
Pending: Senate Aging Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the aging in place task force, and provides for its powers and duties.
Title
Establishes the aging in place task force, and provides for its powers and duties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Aging Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Aging Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-27 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3657C |
2020-04-27 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO AGING |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGING |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-04-29 | Assembly | referred to aging |
2019-04-29 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-04-29 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-04-08 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 3657B |
2019-03-29 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 3657A |
2019-03-26 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.347 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-03-19 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-02-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGING |
Same As/Similar To
A03143 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to aging