NY S03651 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Vetoed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - VETOED MEMO.270
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - VETOED MEMO.270
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the "complex needs patient act" including definitions and reimbursement and billing procedures; preserves access to quality complex rehabilitation technology for patients with complex medical needs.
Title
Establishes the "complex needs patient act" including definitions and reimbursement and billing procedures; preserves access to quality complex rehabilitation technology for patients with complex medical needs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-28 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.270 |
2016-11-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.271 |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | substituted for a5074c |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2016-06-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-06 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1434 |
2016-06-06 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-01-15 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3651D |
2016-01-15 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INSURANCE |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2015-05-28 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3651C |
2015-05-28 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO INSURANCE |
2015-05-08 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO INSURANCE |
2015-04-30 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3651B |
2015-04-30 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2015-02-23 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3651A |
2015-02-23 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2015-02-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A05074 (Same As) 2016-06-14 - substituted by s3651d