NY S03644 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-14 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2451
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-14 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2451
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the discontinuation of utility service to residential customers.
Title
Relates to the discontinuation of utility service to residential customers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-14 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A2451 |
2018-06-14 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1787 |
2018-06-14 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2017-01-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A02451 (Same As) 2018-08-24 - signed chap.213