NY S03616 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-28 - referred to economic development
Pending: Assembly Economic Development, Job Creation, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Removes the street level entrance requirement for licenses for selling alcohol at retail for consumption off the premises.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Removes the street level entrance requirement for licenses for selling alcohol at retail for consumption off the premises.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-05-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-01-28Assemblyreferred to economic development
2014-01-28SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2014-01-28SenatePASSED SENATE
2014-01-23SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2014-01-22Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2014-01-14Senate1ST REPORT CAL.25
2014-01-08SenateREFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
2014-01-08Assemblyreturned to senate
2014-01-08Assemblydied in assembly
2013-05-22Assemblyreferred to codes
2013-05-22SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2013-05-22SenatePASSED SENATE
2013-05-20SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2013-05-08Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2013-05-07Senate1ST REPORT CAL.575
2013-02-07SenateREFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS

Same As/Similar To

A06591 (Same As) 2014-06-09 - reported referred to rules

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback