NY S03609 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the board of standards and appeals and the city planning commission in the city of New York to mail a copy of each application for and appeal of a variance to the city council member, borough president and state legislators for the affected land.
Title
Directs the board of standards and appeals and the city planning commission in the city of New York to mail a copy of each application for and appeal of a variance to the city council member, borough president and state legislators for the affected land.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2014-05-12 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-05-07 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-05-06 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.543 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES |
2013-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2013-05-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2013-05-22 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2013-05-21 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.693 |
2013-02-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES |
Same As/Similar To
A04880 (Same As) 2014-01-08 - referred to cities