NY S03575 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-07 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-07 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that the department of environmental conservation shall deny or suspend any permit issued by the department if the applicant or the permittee or any of its directors, officers or senior management have been convicted of a criminal offense involving fraud, bribery, perjury, an offense against public administration as that term is used in article one hundred ninety-five of the penal law, or conspiracy to commit any such offense.
Title
Provides that the department of environmental conservation shall deny or suspend any permit issued by the department if the applicant or the permittee or any of its directors, officers or senior management have been convicted of a criminal offense involving fraud, bribery, perjury, an offense against public administration as that term is used in article one hundred ninety-five of the penal law, or conspiracy to commit any such offense.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-07 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2024-04-18 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-04-17 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.814 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2023-02-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A08202 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to environmental conservation