NY S03548 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-20 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-20 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Adds rent, building expenses and the cost of utilities to the items for which the state will provide 50% reimbursement to soil and water conservation districts.
Title
Adds rent, building expenses and the cost of utilities to the items for which the state will provide 50% reimbursement to soil and water conservation districts.
Sponsors
Sen. Catharine Young [R] | Sen. Patrick Gallivan [R] | Sen. Thomas O'Mara [R] | Sen. Robert Ortt [R] |
Sen. Patricia Ritchie [R] | Sen. David Valesky [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-20 | Senate | RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2015-05-20 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2015-05-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-05-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-03-26 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-03-25 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.288 |
2015-02-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A07216 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - referred to environmental conservation