NY S03541 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-08 - SIGNED CHAP.465
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-08 - SIGNED CHAP.465
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the education requirements for a license as a professional engineer.
Title
Relates to the education requirements for a license as a professional engineer.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-08 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.465 |
2021-09-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-05-10 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-05-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-05-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.330 |
2021-05-10 | Assembly | substituted for a6809 |
2021-04-28 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2021-04-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-04-28 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-04-26 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-04-21 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.703 |
2021-01-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A06809 (Same As) 2021-05-10 - substituted by s3541