NY S03503 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-06 - PRINT NUMBER 3503A
Pending: Senate Commerce, Economic Development and Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-06 - PRINT NUMBER 3503A
Pending: Senate Commerce, Economic Development and Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the "childcare and early education sector on the economy act" to study the economic impact on the state economy of quality childcare and early education programs for children aged 0-4, and afterschool programs for children aged 5-12.
Title
Establishes the "childcare and early education sector on the economy act" to study the economic impact on the state economy of quality childcare and early education programs for children aged 0-4, and afterschool programs for children aged 5-12.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-06 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3503A |
2014-02-06 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
2013-02-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
Same As/Similar To
A00631 (Same As) 2013-12-06 - enacting clause stricken