NY S03445 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Vetoed on December 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-17 - VETOED MEMO.181
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Exempts food and beverages sold from vending machines for one dollar and fifty cents or less from the sales and use tax.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Exempts food and beverages sold from vending machines for one dollar and fifty cents or less from the sales and use tax.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-12-17AssemblyVETOED MEMO.181
2012-12-05SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2012-06-21Assemblyreturned to senate
2012-06-21Assemblypassed assembly
2012-06-21Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.562
2012-06-21Assemblysubstituted for a5718b
2012-05-31Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2012-05-30SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2012-05-30SenatePASSED SENATE
2012-05-23SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 3445B
2012-05-21SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2012-05-16Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2012-05-15Senate1ST REPORT CAL.795
2012-05-02SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2012-04-17SenatePRINT NUMBER 3445A
2012-04-17SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
2012-01-04SenateREFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
2011-06-02SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2011-02-22SenateREFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS

Same As/Similar To

A05718 (Same As) 2012-06-21 - substituted by s3445b

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S03445&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S03445&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S03445
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S03445&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S03445A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S03445&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S03445B
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2011/S3445#SF1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S03445&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback