NY S03421 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-29 - VETOED MEMO.189
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to establishing topical oxygen wound therapy as a Medicaid benefit.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to establishing topical oxygen wound therapy as a Medicaid benefit.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-29AssemblyVETOED MEMO.189
2017-11-17SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2017-06-21Assemblyreturned to senate
2017-06-21Assemblypassed assembly
2017-06-21Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.642
2017-06-21Assemblysubstituted for a2906
2017-06-13Assemblyreferred to health
2017-06-13SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2017-06-13SenatePASSED SENATE
2017-06-12SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1542
2017-06-12SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2017-05-09SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2017-01-23SenateREFERRED TO HEALTH

Same As/Similar To

A02906 (Same As) 2017-06-21 - substituted by s3421

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback