NY S03403 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO INSURANCE
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO INSURANCE
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Reduces the minimum nonforfeiture interest rate for annuities from one percent to one half of one percent for annuities during the surrender charge period, and from one percent to fifteen hundredths of one percent during any contract period with no surrender charge.
Title
Reduces the minimum nonforfeiture interest rate for annuities from one percent to one half of one percent for annuities during the surrender charge period, and from one percent to fifteen hundredths of one percent during any contract period with no surrender charge.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2023-03-20 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2023-03-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-03-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-03-16 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-03-15 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-03-13 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.477 |
2023-01-31 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A00694 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to insurance