NY S03403 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to unlawful dealing in real property, when a person uses material governmental information, which he or she knows or has reason to know is non-public, to purchase or sell real property; class A misdemeanor.
Title
Relates to unlawful dealing in real property, when a person uses material governmental information, which he or she knows or has reason to know is non-public, to purchase or sell real property; class A misdemeanor.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2019-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-29 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 3403A |
2019-05-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-21 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.809 |
2019-02-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |