NY S03382 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-17 - VETOED MEMO.556
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-17 - VETOED MEMO.556
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for a deduction from personal gross income for expenses incurred in the adoption of a child in the foster care system.
Title
Provides for a deduction from personal gross income for expenses incurred in the adoption of a child in the foster care system.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-17 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.556 |
2014-12-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.434 |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | substituted for a2378b |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2014-06-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-11 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1289 |
2014-06-11 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2014-04-29 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2014-01-14 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3382A |
2014-01-14 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2013-06-11 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2013-06-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-06-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-06-10 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2013-06-05 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2013-06-04 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.999 |
2013-04-16 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2013-04-11 | Senate | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - WITHDRAWN |
2013-03-18 | Senate | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED |
2013-02-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A02378 (Same As) 2014-06-19 - substituted by s3382a