NY S03341 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-19 - PRINT NUMBER 3341B
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-19 - PRINT NUMBER 3341B
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to absentee voting.
Title
Relates to absentee voting.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-19 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3341B |
2016-05-19 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ELECTIONS |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2015-06-11 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3341A |
2015-06-11 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO ELECTIONS |
2015-02-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A02630 (Same As) 2016-06-06 - ordered to third reading rules cal.37