NY S03317 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-08 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-08 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Elevates all computer tampering offenses by one degree in severity.
Title
Elevates all computer tampering offenses by one degree in severity.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-08 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2016-03-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-03-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-03-07 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-03-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-03-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.303 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2015-05-19 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2015-05-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-05-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-05-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.720 |
2015-05-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2015-02-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A02879 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - referred to codes