NY S03309 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to instant run-off elections in the city of New York.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to instant run-off elections in the city of New York.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-20SenateCOMMITTED TO RULES
2018-05-02SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2018-05-01Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2018-04-30Senate1ST REPORT CAL.889
2018-01-11SenatePRINT NUMBER 3309A
2018-01-11SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ELECTIONS
2018-01-03SenateREFERRED TO ELECTIONS
2017-06-21SenateCOMMITTED TO RULES
2017-03-08SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2017-03-07Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2017-03-06Senate1ST REPORT CAL.320
2017-01-20SenateREFERRED TO ELECTIONS

Same As/Similar To

A05752 (Same As) 2017-12-15 - enacting clause stricken
A10844 (Same As) 2018-05-23 - referred to election law

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback