NY S03304 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-04 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Enacts the "voter empowerment act of New York" to streamline the process for registering to vote.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacts the "voter empowerment act of New York" to streamline the process for registering to vote.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-04 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-04SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2018-03-19SenateNOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED
2018-01-31SenatePRINT NUMBER 3304A
2018-01-31SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ELECTIONS
2018-01-03SenateREFERRED TO ELECTIONS
2017-05-01SenateDEFEATED IN ELECTIONS
2017-03-10SenateNOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED
2017-01-20SenateREFERRED TO ELECTIONS

Same As/Similar To

A02278 (Same As) 2017-12-15 - enacting clause stricken

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback