NY S03287 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-28 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-28 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the non-partisan legislative budget office; directs such office shall provide information to legislative committees of the senate and assembly with respect to the state budget, appropriation bills and other bills providing budget authority or tax expenditures; requires such office to report to the temporary president of the senate, the senate minority leader, the speaker of the assembly and the assembly minority leader.
Title
Creates the non-partisan legislative budget office; directs such office shall provide information to legislative committees of the senate and assembly with respect to the state budget, appropriation bills and other bills providing budget authority or tax expenditures; requires such office to report to the temporary president of the senate, the senate minority leader, the speaker of the assembly and the assembly minority leader.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate Ethics and Internal Governance Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Ethics and Internal Governance Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Ethics and Internal Governance Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-28 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO ETHICS AND INTERNAL GOVERNANCE |
2019-02-28 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-02-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO ETHICS AND INTERNAL GOVERNANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A01835 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to governmental operations