NY S03220 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-16 - signed chap.101
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-16 - signed chap.101
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates a portion of the state highway system in Oneida county as the "Officer Kevin F. Crossley Memorial Highway".
Title
Designates a portion of the state highway system in Oneida county as the "Officer Kevin F. Crossley Memorial Highway".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-16 | Senate | signed chap.101 |
2019-07-16 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.234 |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3220B |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2019-05-07 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-05-07 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-05-02 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.251 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | reported |
2019-04-02 | Senate | print number 5701b |
2019-04-02 | Senate | amend (t) and recommit to ways and means |
2019-03-14 | Senate | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-02-28 | Senate | print number 5701a |
2019-02-28 | Senate | amend and recommit to transportation |
2019-02-14 | Senate | referred to transportation |
2019-05-07 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A5701B |
2019-03-18 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 3220B |
2019-03-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-03-12 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.234 |
2019-03-04 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3220A |
2019-03-04 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2019-02-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A05701 (Same As) 2019-07-16 - signed chap.101