NY S03199 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-19 - SIGNED CHAP.269
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-19 - SIGNED CHAP.269
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Includes the possession of a machete within the class A misdemeanor of criminal possession of a weapon in the fourth degree.
Title
Includes the possession of a machete within the class A misdemeanor of criminal possession of a weapon in the fourth degree.
Sponsors
Sen. Tony Avella [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-19 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.269 |
2016-08-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-05-11 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-05-11 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-05-11 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.513 |
2016-05-11 | Assembly | substituted for a8214b |
2016-05-04 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2016-05-04 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-05-04 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2016-04-12 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 3199B |
2016-04-12 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2016-04-12 | Senate | returned to senate |
2016-04-12 | Assembly | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2016-04-05 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2016-04-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-04-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-03-29 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 3199A |
2016-03-28 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-03-23 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-03-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.429 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2015-06-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-01 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1159 |
2015-06-01 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2015-02-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A08214 (Same As) 2016-05-11 - substituted by s3199b