NY S03145 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A112A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to indicating the placement of ballot proposals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to indicating the placement of ballot proposals.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-01SenateSUBSTITUTED BY A112A
2019-03-27SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 3145A
2019-03-27SenateVOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING
2019-03-27Senatereturned to senate
2019-03-27AssemblyRECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY
2019-03-25Assemblyrecommitted to election law
2019-03-25Assemblysubstitution reconsidered
2019-03-18Assemblyordered to third reading cal.123
2019-03-18Assemblysubstituted for a112
2019-03-05Assemblyreferred to election law
2019-03-05SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-03-05SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-02-28SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-02-27Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-02-26Senate1ST REPORT CAL.164
2019-02-04SenateREFERRED TO ELECTIONS

Same As/Similar To

A00112 (Same As) 2019-03-18 - substituted by s3145

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback