NY S03076 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-02 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-02 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for an exemption requirement from registration for ATVs operated on lands owned by the owner or to which the owner has certain contractual rights when the ATV is not operated elsewhere in the state and no consideration is paid to the owner for operation.
Title
Provides for an exemption requirement from registration for ATVs operated on lands owned by the owner or to which the owner has certain contractual rights when the ATV is not operated elsewhere in the state and no consideration is paid to the owner for operation.
Sponsors
Sen. Catharine Young [R] | Sen. John DeFrancisco [R] | Sen. Patrick Gallivan [R] | Sen. Kathleen Marchione [R] |
Sen. Thomas O'Mara [R] | Sen. Patricia Ritchie [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-02 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2016-06-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-05-25 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-05-24 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1104 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2015-06-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-08 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-06-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1218 |
2015-02-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A03782 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - referred to transportation